Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 12:04:06 (UTC).

Deyl vs Agoura Sash & Door

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 Deyl filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Agoura Sash Door. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deyl, Marie R

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Smith Bros Inc

Indemnity Company of California

Agoura Sash & Door Inc

Smith, Dan

Smith, Dan Lee

Smith, Don Everet

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Indemnity Company of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Scott Thomas

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WILCOX, WENDY L.

SOSA, CARLOS E.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA, CARLOS E.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 08/31/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Indemnity Company of California on 08/05/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Indemnity Company of California on 08/05/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 08/03/2016 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2016
  • General Denial filed by Indemnity Company of California on 04/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Answer filed by Smith, Dan; Smith Bros Inc on 04/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Becky DeGeorge, auth to accept) filed by Deyl, Marie R on 03/15/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Deyl, Marie R on 03/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Dan Smith, reg. agt) filed by Deyl, Marie R on 03/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Dan Smith, reg. agt) filed by Deyl, Marie R on 03/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/18/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Deyl, Marie R on 02/19/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint filed by Deyl, Marie R on 02/19/2016. Filed By: Deyl, Marie R(Plaintiff) Refers To: Smith Bros Inc(Defendant) | Agoura Sash & Door Inc(Defendant) | Smith, Dan(Defendant) | Indemnity Company of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH BROS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AGOURA SASH & DOOR INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E