This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 02:12:45 (UTC).

Derek L Sanchez vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Derek L Sanchez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Derek L

Defendants

General Motors LLC

Silver Star Motor Car Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lovasz, Christopher M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sanchez, Derek L on 11/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served John Montijo, CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process) filed by Sanchez, Derek L on 08/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Nicole Stauss, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process) filed by Sanchez, Derek L on 07/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Derek L on 07/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sanchez, Derek L on 07/26/2021. Filed By: Sanchez, Derek L(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Motors LLC(Defendant) | Silver Star Motor Car Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER