This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 14:46:01 (UTC).

Debby Day vs. California Lutheran University

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Debby Day filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against California Lutheran University. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alfaia, Marissa

Avaloa, Genevieve

Day, Debby

Dillon, Megan

Edmonds, Sammy

Ekman, Celeste

Faull, Taryn

Findley, Alexa

Gluckman, Jason

Grau, Rilee

Gunn, Madison

Haapanen, Courtney

Henry, Meghan

Luna, Natalie

Marinesi, Kendall

Defendants

California Lutheran University

Grennan, Karin

Kimball, Chris

Maxwell Doherty, Melissa

Mchugh, Jim

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALTZ, MICHAEL J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023

HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alfaia, Marissa; Avaloa, Genevieve; Day, Debby; Dillon, Megan; Edmonds, Sammy; Ekman, Celeste; Faull, Taryn; Findley, Alexa; Gluckman, Jason; Grau, Rilee;OTHERS on 08/31/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Day, Debby; Young, De Ann; Gluckman, Jason; Grau, Rilee; Haapanen, Courtney; Dillon, Megan; Avaloa, Genevieve; Luna, Natalie; Alfaia, Marissa; Workman, Brittany;OTHERS on 07/18/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketComplaint filed by Day, Debby; Young, De Ann; Gluckman, Jason; Grau, Rilee; Haapanen, Courtney; Dillon, Megan; Avaloa, Genevieve; Luna, Natalie; Alfaia, Marissa; Workman, Brittany;OTHERS on 07/18/2022. Filed By: Dillon, Megan(Plaintiff) | Avaloa, Genevieve(Plaintiff) | Luna, Natalie(Plaintiff) | Alfaia, Marissa(Plaintiff) | Haapanen, Courtney(Plaintiff) | Grau, Rilee(Plaintiff) | Gluckman, Jason(Plaintiff) | Young, De Ann(Plaintiff) | Day, Debby(Plaintiff) | Scali, Sierra(Plaintiff) | Ramirez, Stephanie(Plaintiff) | Workman, Brielle(Plaintiff) | Slabaugh, Catherine(Plaintiff) | Salvati, Lauren(Plaintiff) | Serrano, Olivia(Plaintiff) | Workman, Brittany(Plaintiff) | Winokur, Natalie(Plaintiff) | Henry, Meghan(Plaintiff) | Gunn, Madison(Plaintiff) | Findley, Alexa(Plaintiff) | Ekman, Celeste(Plaintiff) | Onesto, Mia(Plaintiff) | Perez, Sienna(Plaintiff) | Marinesi, Kendall(Plaintiff) | Mendoza, Ariana(Plaintiff) | Faull, Taryn(Plaintiff) | Edmonds, Sammy(Plaintiff) Refers To: California Lutheran University(Defendant) | Kimball, Chris(Defendant) | Maxwell Doherty, Melissa(Defendant) | Mchugh, Jim(Defendant) | Grennan, Karin(Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less