This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 04:04:07 (UTC).

Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 vs. Rancho Simi Recreation and Park District

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Rancho Simi Recreation and Park District. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust

Defendants

All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title thereto

Rancho Simi Recreation and Park District

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Ventura County Transportation Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBOLT, BARTON E

Defendant Attorneys

Pierik, Brian A

Riggs, Jenny L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:50 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMiscellaneous Hearing (CLM) - Notice of Hearing on Judgment to Quiet Title and Plaintiffs Supporting Bench Brief scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Barton E Debolt with Supporting Evidence in Support of Hearing on Judgment to Quiet Title) filed by Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Support of Hearing on Judgment to Quiet Title) filed by Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Brooke Hill in Support of Hearing on Judgment to Quiet Title) filed by Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Tung Ju Hsieh Licensed Land Surveyor in Support of Hearing on Judgment to Quiet Title) filed by Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Plaintiff Deanna C Koehler in Support of Hearing on Judgment to Quiet Title) filed by Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (on Judgment to Quiet Title and Plaintiffs Supporting Bench Brief) filed by Deanna C Koehler Trustee Of The Deanna C Koehler Trust Dated December 14 2020 on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Time: 10:50 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 02/06/2023 10:50:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - /Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,021 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less