This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:36:13 (UTC).

De Medeiros vs. Bag Fund LLC

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 De Medeiros filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bag Fund LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

De Medeiros, Margaret Mari

De Medeiros, Claudio

Defendants

All persons unknown claiming any Legal or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien or Interest in the Property Described in this Complaint which is Adverse to Plaintiffs Title or Creates any Cloud on Plaintiffs Title

Stewart Title Guaranty Company

Bag Fund LLC

All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in this complaint which claim is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCADAM, LESLIE A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAll persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in this complaint which claim is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title added as a Defendant effective 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 10/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by De Medeiros, Claudio; De Medeiros, Margaret Mari on 10/15/2021. Filed By: De Medeiros, Claudio(Plaintiff) | De Medeiros, Margaret Mari(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bag Fund LLC(Defendant) | All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in this complaint which claim is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Stewart Title Guaranty Company ONLY) filed by De Medeiros, Claudio; De Medeiros, Margaret Mari on 08/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent Richard Fannan) filed by De Medeiros, Claudio; De Medeiros, Margaret Mari on 06/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent of Service: Jessie Gastellum, CT Corp.) filed by De Medeiros, Claudio; De Medeiros, Margaret Mari on 06/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by De Medeiros, Claudio; De Medeiros, Margaret Mari on 05/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by De Medeiros, Claudio; De Medeiros, Margaret Mari on 05/21/2021. Filed By: De Medeiros, Margaret Mari(Plaintiff) | De Medeiros, Claudio(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bag Fund LLC(Defendant) | Stewart Title Guaranty Company(Defendant) | All persons unknown claiming any Legal or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien or Interest in the Property Described in this Complaint which is Adverse to Plaintiffs Title or Creates any Cloud on Plaintiffs Title(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAG FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Stewart Titile Guaranty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCADAM, LESLIE A.