This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:22:09 (UTC).

Dawn Marie Ferguson vs. Sturgeon Services International Inc

Case Summary

On 07/01/2014 Dawn Marie Ferguson filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Sturgeon Services International Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ferguson, Dawn Marie

Defendants

Sturgeon Services International Inc

True, Matt

Tweedt, Ken

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HERBERT, JOSEPH

KREUZER, LOUIS H. II

Defendant Attorney

Frederick, Christopher S

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (time estimate 7 days); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2014
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 09/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 09/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Motion - Other (to stay action pending completion of contractual arbitration) filed by Sturgeon Services International Inc; True, Matt; Tweedt, Ken on 09/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt filed by Ferguson, Dawn Marie on 09/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Christopher S Frederick signed in behalf) filed by Ferguson, Dawn Marie on 09/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Christopher S Frederick signed in behalf) filed by Ferguson, Dawn Marie on 09/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/24/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ferguson, Dawn Marie on 07/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Complaint filed by Ferguson, Dawn Marie on 07/01/2014. Filed By: Ferguson, Dawn Marie(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sturgeon Services International Inc(Defendant) | True, Matt(Defendant) | Tweedt, Ken(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less