This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 11:27:56 (UTC).

Dawn Christie vs. Martha Vincent

Case Summary

On 12/03/2010 Dawn Christie filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martha Vincent. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondent / Appellees, Appellants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

Christie, Dawn

Pequignot, Johnny

Togetherness Productions LLC

Vincent, Dr. Martha

Ridge, Billy

Club Estates Property Owners Association

Jackson, Billy

Sequels

Jackson, Billie

Vincent, Martha

Defendants, Respondent / Appellees, Appellants, Cross Appellants and Cross Plaintiffs

Keller Williams realty Westlake Village

North Ranch Country Club estates Property Owners Association

Snyder, Martha

Cohen, Jordan

Outwest Holdings Inc

Re/Max Olson and Associaites Inc

Snyder, Marsha

Club Estates Property Owners Association

Vincent, Dr. Martha

Jackson, Billy

Sequels

Jackson, Billie

Ridge, Billy

Vincent, Martha

Ridge, William

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent / Appellee, Appellant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BOHRER, JEFFREY B. BOR

CHANEY, ALBERT LON III

Santos, Patrick T

COHEN, BARRY E

REAGAN, BARRY J.

Respondent / Appellee, Defendant, Cross Appellant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

REAGAN, BARRY J.

COHEN, BARRY E

KALE, MICHAEL A.

Feldheim, Jonathan A

Respondent / Appellee, Appellant, Defendant, Cross Appellant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, BARRY E

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:17 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:47 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 4:34 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:17 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
1,962 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2010
  • Request for Judicial Notice (in Opposition to Plaintiffs Exparte Motion) filed by Vincent, Martha on 12/08/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • Opposition (to Plaintiffs exparte Motion for Writ of Execution) filed by Vincent, Martha on 12/08/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • Ex Parte - for Claim & Delivery and TRO scheduled for 12/08/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in S5 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny; Togetherness Productions LLC on 12/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny; Togetherness Productions LLC on 12/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • Declaration - Other (for Ex Parte Writ of Possession) filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny; Togetherness Productions LLC on 12/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • Case assigned to Department S5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny; Togetherness Productions LLC on 12/03/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny; Togetherness Productions LLC on 12/03/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • Complaint filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny; Togetherness Productions LLC on 12/03/2010. Filed By: Christie, Dawn(Plaintiff) | Pequignot, Johnny(Plaintiff) | Togetherness Productions LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Vincent, Martha(Defendant) | Ridge, Billy(Defendant) | Snyder, Martha(Defendant) | Keller Williams realty Westlake Village(Defendant) | Cohen, Jordan(Defendant) | Re/Max Olson and Associaites Inc(Defendant) | Jackson, Billy(Defendant) | Sequels(Defendant) | North Ranch Country Club estates Property Owners Association(Defendant) | Club Estates Property Owners Association(Defendant) | Outwest Holdings Inc(Defendant) | Snyder, Marsha(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sequel LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Outwest Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant