This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 16:04:59 (UTC).

David R Gray Inc vs. Richard Hauser

Case Summary

On 07/16/2014 David R Gray Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Richard Hauser. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David R Gray Inc

Defendant

Hauser, Richard

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 09/08/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signed by Michelle Lindholm on 07.21.14) filed by David R Gray Inc on 07/31/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Plaintiffs Claim sent Certifed Mail to Richard Hauser DBA Capital Real Estate Inc on 7-16-14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 09/08/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by David R Gray Inc on 07/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by David R Gray Inc on 07/16/2014. Filed By: David R Gray Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hauser, Richard(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less