This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 15:04:40 (UTC).

David Kaplan vs. Conejo Dermatology

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 David Kaplan filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Conejo Dermatology. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kaplan, David

Kaplan, Eileen

Defendants

Conejo Dermatology

Mitchell MD, Jeanette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bunch, Bruce M.

Defendant Attorney

LAW, YUK K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Mitchell MD, Jeanette; Conejo Dermatology on 08/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mitchell MD, Jeanette; Conejo Dermatology on 08/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketLAW, YUK K. added as a effective 08/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Served Aaron Doe, Office Manager) filed by Kaplan, David; Kaplan, Eileen on 07/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (By serving Aaron Doe, Office Manager) filed by Kaplan, David on 07/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/14/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kaplan, David; Kaplan, Eileen on 07/05/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kaplan, David; Kaplan, Eileen on 07/05/2022. Filed By: Kaplan, Eileen(Plaintiff) | Kaplan, David(Plaintiff) Refers To: Conejo Dermatology(Defendant) | Mitchell MD, Jeanette(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less