This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 04:05:21 (UTC).

Daria Barrett Crittenden vs. Kelly D Mason

Case Summary

On 06/26/2015 Daria Barrett Crittenden filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kelly D Mason. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crittenden, Daria Barrett

Needle, Jed Peter

Defendants

Mason, Erick G

Mason, Kelly D

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment (Denied) filed by Crittenden, Daria Barrett; Needle, Jed Peter on 09/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Answer to Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment filed by Mason, Erick G; Mason, Kelly D on 09/16/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Proof of Service (Supplemental Authorities in Support of the Motion to Cancel Judgment Wrong Law Applied, self drafted signed on 9-12-2015) filed by Crittenden, Daria Barrett; Needle, Jed Peter on 09/14/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Attachment - Other (Supplemental Authorities to Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer) filed by Crittenden, Daria Barrett; Needle, Jed Peter on 09/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Judgment for Mason, Kelly D;Mason, Erick G against Crittenden, Daria Barrett;Needle, Jed Peter in the amount of: 0.00 principal, punitive damages, 0.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 08/10/2015. Defendant(s) owe Plaintiff(s) nothing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 08/10/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Kelly D Mason, Erick G Mason and AGAINST Daria Barrett Crittenden, Jed Peter Needle in the amount of $0 principal, $0 costs. Judgment Details: Defendant(s) owe Plaintiff(s) nothing. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (service to Tyler Mason, Son of Defendant on 6-29-2015, mailed on 7-1-2015, cost $40.00) filed by Crittenden, Daria Barrett on 07/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (served Tyler Mason on 6-29-15; cost 40.00) filed by Crittenden, Daria Barrett on 07/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/10/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Crittenden, Daria Barrett; Needle, Jed Peter on 06/26/2015. Filed By: Crittenden, Daria Barrett(Plaintiff) | Needle, Jed Peter(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mason, Kelly(Defendant) | Mason, Erick(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less