This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 08:01:30 (UTC).

Daly Group Inc vs. Forrest Lucas

Case Summary

On 04/23/2012 Daly Group Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Forrest Lucas. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Daly Family Companies Inc

Daly Group Inc

Daly, Vincent

Daly, Vincent J

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Renezeder, Carl H

Baldwin, James

CRFL Family Apartments LP

CRFL Housing Partners LLC

Lucas Oil Products Inc

Lucas, Forrest

Oakwood Development Inc

Oxnard CRFL Partners LLC

Oxnard Village Family Apartments LLC

Oxnard Village Family Apartments LP

Oxnard Village Investments LLC

Renezeder, Carl

WCH Affordable II LLC

Western Community Housing Inc

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Shuck, Thomas E

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Van Ligten, Hans

Clark, Christopher R

Austin, Mark J.

Rice, Kevin G

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Joinder; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 46; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:34 PM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:21 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:06 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:55 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
377 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Carl H. Renezeder, registered agent for service of process) filed by Daly Group Inc on 05/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Carl H. Renezeder, registered agent for service of process) filed by Daly Group Inc on 05/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Carl H. Renezeder, registered agent for service of process) filed by Daly Group Inc on 05/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Graham P. Espley Jones, registered agent for service of process) filed by Daly Group Inc on 05/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Catherine Visichio, registered agent for service of process) filed by Daly Group Inc on 05/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Notice of Errata (Re exhibits to compmlaint) filed by Daly Family Companies Inc; Daly Group Inc on 05/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Daly Group Inc; Daly Family Companies Inc on 04/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daly Group Inc; Daly Family Companies Inc on 04/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Complaint filed by Daly Group Inc; Daly Family Companies Inc on 04/23/2012. Filed By: Daly Group Inc(Plaintiff) | Daly Family Companies Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lucas, Forrest(Defendant) | Lucas Oil Products Inc(Defendant) | Renezeder, Carl(Defendant) | Baldwin, James(Defendant) | Oxnard CRFL Partners LLC(Defendant) | CRFL Housing Partners LLC(Defendant) | CRFL Family Apartments LP(Defendant) | Oxnard Village Investments LLC(Defendant) | Western Community Housing Inc(Defendant) | Oakwood Development Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less