This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 22:31:44 (UTC).

Crimson California Pipeline vs So California Edison

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 Crimson California Pipeline filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against So California Edison. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crimson Pipeline LLC

Crimson California Pipeline LP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Southern California Edison Company

Hot Line Construction Inc

Southern California Edison

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Hot Line Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUGHES, PERRY S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BLANC, CARLA MARGOLIS

Chavez, Vanessa Franco

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Chavez, Vanessa Franco

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: T/E 10 days; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Description: or, in the alternative, summary adjudication against deft Hotline Construction Inc; Memo of Supporti...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Counsel (of Appearance of Paul D Rasmussen as Counsel of Record for Defendant Hot Line Construction Inc) filed by Hot Line Construction Inc on 03/21/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Hearing Continuance on Plaintiffs Crimson California Pipeline LP and Crimson Pipeline LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication against Defendant Hot Line Construction Inc.) filed by Crimson Pipeline LLC; Crimson California Pipeline LP on 03/20/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - or, in the alternative, summary adjudication against deft Hotline Construction Inc; Memo of Supporting Points and Authorities scheduled for 06/18/2018 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketSummons issued on 02/14/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint (of Southern California Edison Company) filed by Southern California Edison Company on 02/14/2017. Filed By: Southern California Edison Company(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Hot Line Construction Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed by Southern California Edison Company on 02/14/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company added as a Defendant effective 02/14/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Angelique Duran Assistant) filed by Crimson California Pipeline LP; Crimson Pipeline LLC on 12/21/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Cristina Limon Registered Agent Service of Process) filed by Crimson Pipeline LLC; Crimson California Pipeline LP on 12/21/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crimson California Pipeline LP; Crimson Pipeline LLC on 12/06/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Crimson California Pipeline LP; Crimson Pipeline LLC on 12/06/2016. Filed By: Crimson California Pipeline LP(Plaintiff) | Crimson Pipeline LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hot Line Construction Inc(Defendant) | Southern California Edison(Defendant) | Southern California Edison Company(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crimson Pipeline, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRIMSON CALIFORNIA PIPELINE L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOT LINE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant