Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 11:12:04 (UTC).

Crane vs Baxter

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Crane filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Baxter. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crane, Samantha

Crane, Kevin

Defendants

Tad Baxter as the Successor Trustee of The Bussans Trust

Gates, Debbie

Everest Realty Group LTD

Rodriguez, Eileen

Peak Realty Co

Mark Bussan Jr as Successor Trustee of The Bussan Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stelnick, Steffanie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 01/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Female/White/60's - Appeared to match picture of defendants wife) filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 10/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 - Mark Bussan Jr as Successor Trustee of the Bussan Trust) filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 08/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMark Bussan Jr as Successor Trustee of The Bussan Trust added as a Defendant effective 08/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Tim Baxter Member of Household) filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 08/04/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 07/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Monica Ferris Director of Operations) filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 07/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Monica Ferris Director of Operations) filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 07/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Destiny Birki Client Rep Agent for Service of Process) filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 07/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 06/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Crane, Kevin; Crane, Samantha on 06/29/2020. Filed By: Crane, Samantha(Plaintiff) | Crane, Kevin(Plaintiff) Refers To: Gates, Debbie(Defendant) | Tad Baxter as the Successor Trustee of The Bussans Trust(Defendant) | Peak Realty Co(Defendant) | Everest Realty Group LTD(Defendant) | Rodriguez, Eileen(Defendant) | Mark Bussan Jr as Successor Trustee of The Bussan Trust(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everest Realty Group California LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STELNICK STEFFANIE DANIELLE