This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 22:54:08 (UTC).

Covenant Care California LLC vs. Tomas J Aragon in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and State Public Health Officer

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Covenant Care California LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Tomas J Aragon in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and State Public Health Officer. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Covenant Care California LLC

Respondents

California Department of Public Health

Department of Healthcare Services

Michelle Baas in her official capacity as director of the Department of Healthcare Services

Tomas J Aragon in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and State Public Health Officer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Kiepen, Scott J

Gordon, Bridget A

Respondent Attorney

Kau, Nicole J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 9:51 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 10:18 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: re Writ of Mandate filed; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 10:18 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:18 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court's Motion (CLM) heard 01/14/2022 10:18:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference - re Writ of Mandate filed scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Remote Appearance; Throughout the Case) filed by Department of Healthcare Services; Tomas J Aragon in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and State Public Health Officer; California Department of Public Health; Michelle Baas in her official capacity as director of the Department of Healthcare Services on 01/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Covenant Care California LLC on 01/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint, to Extend Deadline to File Answer for All Respondents) filed by Tomas J Aragon in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and State Public Health Officer; California Department of Public Health; Michelle Baas in her official capacity as director of the Department of Healthcare Services; Department of Healthcare Services on 12/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP (Judge Bennett) filed by Covenant Care California LLC on 11/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (by Electronic Service. Summons for Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate, Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate, Notice of Case Assignment, Civil Case Cover Sheet) filed by Covenant Care California LLC on 11/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (by Electronic Service. Served Summons for Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate, Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate, Notice of Case Assignment and Civil Case Cover Sheet) filed by Covenant Care California LLC on 11/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 9:51 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 11/09/2021 09:51:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - re Writ of Mandate filed scheduled for 12/09/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 21 at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 11/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Covenant Care California LLC on 11/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Covenant Care California LLC on 11/03/2021. Filed By: Covenant Care California LLC(Petitioner) Refers To: Tomas J Aragon in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and State Public Health Officer(Respondent) | Department of Healthcare Services(Respondent) | Michelle Baas in her official capacity as director of the Department of Healthcare Services(Respondent) | California Department of Public Health(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Covenant Care California, Inc. dba Wagner heights Nursing & Rehabilitation Center is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget A. Gordon