This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:14:52 (UTC).

Community Memorial vs Heritage Provider

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 Community Memorial filed an Other lawsuit against Heritage Provider. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Community Memorial Health System

Defendants

Regal Medical Group Inc

Bakersfield Family Medical Group Inc

Oasis Independent Medical Associates Inc

High Desert Medical Corporation

Lakeside Medical Group Inc

Heritage Provider Network Inc

Sierra Medical Group Inc

Affiliated Doctors of Orange County Medical Group

Desert Medical Group Inc

Lakeside Medical Organization

High Desert Medical Corporation A Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tooch, Daron L.

Defendant Attorney

Kendall, Jamie O.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Michael Fate, registered Agent) filed by Community Memorial Health System on 03/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Michael Fate, registered Agent) filed by Community Memorial Health System on 03/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Michael Fate, registered Agent) filed by Community Memorial Health System on 03/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Michael Fate, registered Agent) filed by Community Memorial Health System on 03/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Michael Fate, registered Agent) filed by Community Memorial Health System on 03/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Michael Fate, registered Agent) filed by Community Memorial Health System on 03/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/24/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Community Memorial Health System on 02/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Complaint filed by Community Memorial Health System on 02/21/2017. Filed By: Community Memorial Health System(Plaintiff) Refers To: Heritage Provider Network Inc(Defendant) | Regal Medical Group Inc(Defendant) | Lakeside Medical Group Inc(Defendant) | Oasis Independent Medical Associates Inc(Defendant) | Desert Medical Group Inc(Defendant) | Bakersfield Family Medical Group Inc(Defendant) | High Desert Medical Corporation(Defendant) | Affiliated Doctors of Orange County Medical Group(Defendant) | Sierra Medical Group Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Desert Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant