Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/16/2020 at 00:00:38 (UTC).

Communications Relay LLC vs. Skycomm Inc

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Communications Relay LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Skycomm Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Communications Relay LLC

Defendants

Castillo, Nicholas

Skycomm Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIGIUSEPPE, STEPHEN A.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by Communications Relay LLC rejected on 02/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Stephen A Digiuseppe and Declaration of James A Kay Jr in Support of Default Judgment Against Defendants; Exhibits in Support Thereon) filed by Communications Relay LLC on 01/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Communications Relay LLC on 01/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does (All DOES) filed by Communications Relay LLC on 01/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDefault vacated as to Skycomm Inc on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Skycomm Inc on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Communications Relay LLC on 11/12/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Castillo, Nicholas on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Communications Relay LLC on 11/12/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Nicholas Castillo Agent Authorized by the California Secretary of State to receive service of process) filed by Communications Relay LLC on 09/25/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Communications Relay LLC on 09/25/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSummons issued on 09/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Communications Relay LLC on 09/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Communications Relay LLC on 09/11/2019. Filed By: Communications Relay LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Skycomm Inc(Defendant) | Castillo, Nicholas(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNICATIONS RELAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIGIUSEPPE STEPHEN ANTHONY