This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 21:38:29 (UTC).

Colt Sport vs Aldrich

Case Summary

On 12/17/2014 Colt Sport filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Aldrich. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colt Sport Motors Inc

Defendants

2007 Alrdich Charitable Remainder Unitrust

Aldrich, Donald

Aldrich, Solvang

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Judgment for Aldrich, Donald ;Aldrich, Solveig ;2007 Alrdich Charitable Remainder Unitrust against Colt Sport Motors Inc in the amount of: 0.00 principal, punitive damages, 0.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 02/02/2015. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 02/02/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Donald Aldrich, Solveig Aldrich, 2007 Alrdich Charitable Remainder Unitrust and AGAINST Colt Sport Motors Inc in the amount of $0 principal, $0 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (served on 12/18/14; cost 35.00) filed by Colt Sport Motors Inc on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (Served Donald Aldrich, trustee, on 12/18/14; cost 35.00) filed by Colt Sport Motors Inc on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Served Donald Aldrich, husband, on 12/18/14; cost 35.00) filed by Colt Sport Motors Inc on 12/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/02/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Colt Sport Motors Inc on 12/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Colt Sport Motors Inc on 12/17/2014. Filed By: Colt Sport Motors Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: 2007 Alrdich Charitable Remainder Unitrust(Defendant) | Aldrich, Donald(Defendant) | Aldrich, Solvang(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLT SPORT MOTORS INC. is a litigant