This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 00:05:45 (UTC).

Cohen vs Channel Islands Aviation

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Cohen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Channel Islands Aviation. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cohen, Marc

Harris, Taylor

Defendant

Channel Islands Aviation Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lovendosky, Keith A.

Defendant Attorney

Mkryan, Joseph Z

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (7 day); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (7 day); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Service of Minute Order dated February 28, 2020) filed by Cohen, Marc; Harris, Taylor on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting (Stipulation to Continue Trial, Pre Trial Cutoffs, and Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 05/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 04/11/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in 22 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - (7 day) scheduled for 05/23/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Other (to Continue Trial, Pre Trial Cutoffs, and Mandatory Settlement Conference; [Proposed] Order Thereon) filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 05/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (7 day); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harris, Taylor on 10/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case No 56.19.534077.CU.PO.VTA) filed by Harris, Taylor on 10/01/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Harris, Taylor on 10/01/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case No 56.19.534077.CU.PO.VTA) filed by Cohen, Marc on 10/01/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cohen, Marc on 10/01/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cohen, Marc on 10/01/2019. Filed By: Cohen, Marc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Channel Islands Aviation Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHANNEL ISLANDS AVIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVENDOSKY KEITH A.