This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 22:34:33 (UTC).

Clint Stremcha vs. DCH Oxnard Inc

Case Summary

On 01/16/2015 Clint Stremcha filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DCH Oxnard Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stremcha, Clint

Defendants

DCH Oxnard Inc

DCH Auto Group USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hefelfinger, Brian D

Defendant Attorneys

Boggs, John P.

REESE, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Compel Arbitration; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Compel Arbitration; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:12 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Compel Arbitration; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Compel Arbitration; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2015
  • Notice of Hearing (on Petition to compel arbitration and stay or dismiss civil action) filed by DCH Oxnard Inc on 03/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 03/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Motion to Compel - Petition to compel arbitration and stay or dismiss civil action scheduled for 05/13/2015 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Motion - Other (Petition to compel arbitration and stay or dismiss civil action) filed by DCH Oxnard Inc on 03/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Wade Kackstetter - person authorized to accept) filed by Stremcha, Clint on 01/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/17/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stremcha, Clint on 01/16/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Complaint filed by Stremcha, Clint on 01/16/2015. Filed By: Stremcha, Clint(Plaintiff) Refers To: DCH Oxnard Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less