This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/16/2018 at 02:45:45 (UTC).

Claude R Goodman vs. Pedro Lopez

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 Claude R Goodman filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pedro Lopez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goodman, Claude R

Defendant

Lopez, Pedro

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 07/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 05/15/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 07/17/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk ($15.00, Signed by Claudia Lopez, no date given) filed by Goodman, Claude R on 04/14/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Plaintiffs claim mailed certified to Pedro Lopez on 4/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 05/15/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Goodman, Claude R on 04/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Goodman, Claude R on 04/11/2017. Filed By: Goodman, Claude R(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lopez, Pedro(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.