Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:42 (UTC).

City of Oxnard vs. Richard Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 City of Oxnard filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Richard Garcia. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Oxnard

Defendant

Garcia, Richard

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 10/06/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 23 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant Unserved (Bad Address, believed to have moved to Texas 2 years ago, Cost $40.00) filed by City of Oxnard on 08/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 08/18/2014 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 10/06/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 23 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk ($15.00, signature illegible on 7/10/14) filed by City of Oxnard on 07/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim sent Certified Mail to Richard Garcia on 7-9-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/18/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 23 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 45.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by City of Oxnard on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by City of Oxnard on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by City of Oxnard on 06/27/2014. Filed By: City of Oxnard(Plaintiff) Refers To: Garcia, Richard(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less