This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 03:02:21 (UTC).

City of Oxnard vs. All Persons Interested in the Matter

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 City of Oxnard filed an Other lawsuit against All Persons Interested in the Matter. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Oxnard

Defendants

All Persons Interested in the Matter of the Issuance and Sale of Bonds for the Purpose of Refunding Certain Obligations Owed by the City of Oxnard to the Public Employees Retirement System Under the Public Employees Retirement Law and all Proceedings

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Starr, Aaron

Ventura County Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALL, ROBIN D.

Defendant Attorney

BITTLE, TIMOTHY A.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:23 AM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:32 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff the City of Oxnard's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendants Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, Ventura County Taxpayers Association, and Aaron Star's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by City of Oxnard on 01/25/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff the City of Oxnard's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendants Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, Ventura County Taxpayers Association, and Aaron Star's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by City of Oxnard on 01/25/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMail Returned Undeliverable (As to Timothy A Bittle - Minute Order 12/21/22 - Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMail Returned Undeliverable (As to Timothy A Bittle - Minute Order 12/21/22 - Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:32 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:32 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter heard 12/21/2022 09:32:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter heard 12/21/2022 09:32:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Served Laura Dougherty, Senior Staff Attorney) filed by City of Oxnard on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Served Laura Dougherty, Senior Staff Attorney) filed by City of Oxnard on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2,045 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less