This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 11:56:49 (UTC).

Cirenia Lopez vs. Felicito Cruz

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 Cirenia Lopez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Felicito Cruz. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lopez, Cirenia

Defendants

Cruz, Felicito

Luis, Felicito Cruz

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing - Small Claims; Description: Reference to case number D377360; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Miscellaneous Hearing - Small Claims - Reference to case number D377360 scheduled for 03/30/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Declaration and Request for Interpreter) filed by Luis, Felicito Cruz on 03/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 03/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (Served on 3/9/16; Cost: 0.00) filed by Lopez, Cirenia on 03/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Request - Other (For Interpreter) filed by Luis, Felicito Cruz on 03/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Declaration - Other (of Felicito Cruz Luis) filed by Luis, Felicito Cruz on 03/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Luis, Felicito Cruz added as a Defendant effective 03/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Lopez, Cirenia on 02/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Lopez, Cirenia Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 03/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Lopez, Cirenia on 02/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lopez, Cirenia on 02/16/2016. Filed By: Lopez, Cirenia(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cruz, Felicito(Defendant) | Luis, Felicito(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less