This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 16:42:51 (UTC).

Christopher Huston vs. Healy Electric

Case Summary

On 07/31/2014 Christopher Huston filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Healy Electric. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondent / Appellees

Calderon, Ignacio

Castro, David

Davis, Lloyd

Doner, Michael

Huston, Christopher

Lucio, Jose

Troup, Jeffrey

Niehardt, Rudolph

Kenz, Chirstopher

Pienado, Alan

Ormerod, Hailey

Arcienega, Paul

Defendants and Appellants

Federal Construction Services Inc.

Healy Electric

Healy, Brent Mansfield

Power Smart Electric

Ferdolage, James

Healy Electric & Control Inc

PowerSmart Electric Inc

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

MOSCOWITZ, ELLYN

Defendant Attorneys

Feingold, Erik B.

NOMI, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:49 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:54 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 1:49 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:54 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2014
  • Default entered as to Healy Electric on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (court judgment) filed by Huston, Christopher on 10/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Maria Ramirez, in charge of office) filed by Huston, Christopher on 08/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Maria Ramirez, in charge of office) filed by Huston, Christopher on 08/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Maria Ramirez for Brent Healy, auth to accept) filed by Huston, Christopher on 08/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Summons issued on 07/31/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/24/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Huston, Christopher; Troup, Jeffrey; Davis, Lloyd; Doner, Michael; Castro, David; Calderon, Ignacio; Lucio, Jose on 07/31/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Complaint filed by Huston, Christopher; Troup, Jeffrey; Davis, Lloyd; Doner, Michael; Castro, David; Calderon, Ignacio; Lucio, Jose on 07/31/2014. Filed By: Huston, Christopher(Plaintiff) | Troup, Jeffrey(Plaintiff) | Davis, Lloyd(Plaintiff) | Doner, Michael(Plaintiff) | Castro, David(Plaintiff) | Calderon, Ignacio(Plaintiff) | Lucio, Jose(Plaintiff) Refers To: Healy Electric(Defendant) | Federal Construction Services Inc.(Defendant) | Healy, Brent(Defendant) | Healy Electric & Control Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less