This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 01:42:32 (UTC).

Christine Yacoby vs. Camarillo Premium Outlets

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Christine Yacoby filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Camarillo Premium Outlets. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yacoby, Christine

Defendants

Camarillo Premium Outlets

Simon Property Group Inc

Premium Outlet Partners LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Castranova, Elia James

Defendant Attorney

Baxter, Samuel S.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Description: (7 day Jury Trial); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 03/11/2020 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketThe Court orders the Complaint filed by Christine Yacoby dismissed as to Camarillo Premium Outlets without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - (7 day) scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Simon Property Group Inc; Premium Outlet Partners LP on 02/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Simon Property Group Inc; Premium Outlet Partners LP on 02/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Yacoby, Christine on 02/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Old: Stephen T Pelletier of Higgs Fletcher, New: Stephen T Pelletier of Price Pelletier LLP) filed by Premium Outlet Partners LP on 01/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer filed by Simon Property Group Inc on 12/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Naming Doe 2 as Premium Outlet Partners LP) filed by Yacoby, Christine on 11/18/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPremium Outlet Partners LP added as a Defendant effective 11/18/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDemand (for Jury Trial) filed by Yacoby, Christine on 10/21/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketSimon Property Group Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Adding Doe 1 - Simon Property Group Inc) filed by Yacoby, Christine on 10/10/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/11/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yacoby, Christine on 10/03/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Yacoby, Christine on 10/03/2019. Filed By: Yacoby, Christine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Camarillo Premium Outlets(Defendant) | Simon Property Group Inc(Defendant) | Premium Outlet Partners LP(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIUM OUTLET PARTNERS L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Simon Property Goup LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baxter, Samuel S.