This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 11:10:01 (UTC).

Christie Lee Mailander vs. Sky Ready Mix Inc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Christie Lee Mailander filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sky Ready Mix Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mailander, Christie Lee

Defendants

Sky Ready Mix Inc

Carrillo, Cristian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Salazar, Theida

Yagoubzadeh, Joshua E

Defendant Attorney

Bozoghlian, Rodrigo

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (7 day); Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketStatus Hearing Re: MSC Meet and Confer Under CRC 3.724 - scheduled for 06/10/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - (7 day) scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mailander, Christie Lee on 03/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (7 day); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial & All Related Dates; Trial date continued until 09-13-21 @ 1:30pm in dept 40) filed by Sky Ready Mix Inc; Carrillo, Cristian on 10/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - (7 day) scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Carrillo, Cristian; Sky Ready Mix Inc on 02/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Carrillo, Cristian on 02/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Ruby Carrillo Mother) filed by Mailander, Christie Lee on 11/20/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer filed by Sky Ready Mix Inc on 11/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served-Mirna Lopez, Office Manager) filed by Mailander, Christie Lee on 11/04/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Mailander, Christie Lee on 10/01/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mailander, Christie Lee on 09/30/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mailander, Christie Lee on 09/30/2019. Filed By: Mailander, Christie Lee(Plaintiff) Refers To: Carrillo, Cristian(Defendant) | Sky Ready Mix Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sky Ready Mix Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salazar, Theida

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E