This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 15:58:05 (UTC).

Chloe Diemer vs. Jose Trujillo De Lira

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Chloe Diemer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Trujillo De Lira. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diemer, Chloe

Defendant

Trujillo De Lira, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hankey, Jordan D

Defendant Attorney

BECK, DWAYNE S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Diemer, Chloe on 11/23/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (of Taking the Deposition of Plaintiff) filed by Trujillo De Lira, Jose on 10/18/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Trujillo De Lira, Jose on 05/27/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Trujillo De Lira, Jose on 05/27/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Trujillo De Lira, Jose on 05/27/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketBECK, DWAYNE S. added as a effective 05/27/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diemer, Chloe on 03/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Diemer, Chloe on 03/29/2021. Filed By: Diemer, Chloe(Plaintiff) Refers To: Trujillo De Lira, Jose(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANKEY JORDAN D.