This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 20:40:16 (UTC).

Charles M Crofoot vs. COUNTY OF VENTURA

Case Summary

On 03/04/2013 Charles M Crofoot filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF VENTURA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

Crofoot, Charles M Jr

Defendants and Respondent / Appellees

COUNTY OF VENTURA

Gregory D Totten District Attorney of the County of Ventura

Harris, Kamala D

State of California

California Department of Justice

Defendants, Respondents and Respondent / Appellees

State of California

California Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Schneider, Calvin C III

Barrett, Edmont T

Appellant Attorney

Quinn, Stephane

Defendant Attorney

Porche, Marina

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Kim, Esther P.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:27 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:31 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:31 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:27 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2013
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Reply to Plaintiff's Oppositin to Demur) filed by Gregory D Totten District Attorney of the County of Ventura; COUNTY OF VENTURA on 05/14/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Opposition (to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Relief) filed by Crofoot, Charles M Jr on 05/07/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Demurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 05/21/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Demurrer filed by COUNTY OF VENTURA; Gregory D Totten District Attorney of the County of Ventura on 04/17/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Crofoot, Charles M Jr on 03/26/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Rachael Beltran clerk of the board auth to accept) filed by Crofoot, Charles M Jr on 03/26/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/07/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crofoot, Charles M Jr on 03/04/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Complaint (To determine applicability of State Statutes CCP 1060) filed by Crofoot, Charles M Jr on 03/04/2013. Filed By: Crofoot, Charles M Jr(Plaintiff) Refers To: COUNTY OF VENTURA(Defendant) | Gregory D Totten District Attorney of the County of Ventura(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less