This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 09:07:45 (UTC).

Ceballos vs. Century 21

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Ceballos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Century 21. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ceballos, Hans

Desteny Orellana an individual by and through her guardian ad litem Maria Orellana

Ceballos, Edwin

Yerik Ceballos an individual by and through his guardian ad litem Maria Orellana

Orellana, Maria

Defendants

Century 21 Everest Realty Group Community Foundation

Robert T De Leon Trustee of the Robert T De Leon Trust

Everest Realty Group California Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nielsen, Tanner

Defendant Attorneys

Velasco, Gerald B

Klier Erlich, Rinat

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ceballos, Edwin; Ceballos, Hans; Desteny Orellana; Orellana, Maria; Yerik Ceballos on 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Posting Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631) filed by Robert T De Leon Trustee of the Robert T De Leon Trust dated October 3 2002 on 04/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Robert T De Leon Trustee of the Robert T De Leon Trust dated October 3 2002 on 04/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Everest Realty Group California Ltd on 04/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEverest Realty Group California Ltd added as a Defendant effective 04/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Maria Orellana) filed by Desteny Orellana an individual by and through her guardian ad litem Maria Orellana on 01/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Maria Orellana) filed by Yerik Ceballos an individual by and through his guardian ad litem Maria Orellana on 01/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ceballos, Edwin; Orellana, Maria; Ceballos, Hans; Desteny Orellana an individual by and through her guardian ad litem Maria Orellana; Yerik Ceballos an individual by and through his guardian ad litem Maria Orellana on 01/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ceballos, Edwin; Orellana, Maria; Ceballos, Hans; Desteny Orellana an individual by and through her guardian ad litem Maria Orellana; Yerik Ceballos an individual by and through his guardian ad litem Maria Orellana on 01/11/2021. Filed By: Orellana, Maria(Plaintiff) | Ceballos, Edwin(Plaintiff) | Yerik Ceballos an individual by and through his guardian ad litem Maria Orellana(Plaintiff) | Ceballos, Hans(Plaintiff) | Desteny Orellana an individual by and through her guardian ad litem Maria Orellana(Plaintiff) Refers To: Robert T De Leon Trustee of the Robert T De Leon Trust dated October 3 2002(Defendant) | Century 21 Everest Realty Group Community Foundation(Defendant) | Everest Realty Group California Ltd(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everest Realty Group California LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Velasco, Gerald B