This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/10/2022 at 01:01:19 (UTC).

Cauthron vs. General Logistics

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Cauthron filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against General Logistics. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cauthron, Brian

Defendants

General Logistics Systems US Interim Inc

General Logistics Systems US Inc

Golden State Overnight Delivery Service Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Crawford, Matthew

Horton, Peter J

Mara, David

Defendant Attorney

Ridley, Eileen R

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:57 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 4:38 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Hearing; Description: re: Stay; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: and class action designation; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Hearing; Description: re: Stay; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: and class action designation; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketStatus Hearing - re: Stay scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to Sept 7 2022 at 8:30 am in CR 20) filed by General Logistics Systems US Inc; General Logistics Systems US Interim Inc; Cauthron, Brian on 03/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: and class action designation; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Time: 4:38 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Other (and Order to Stay Matter and Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Cauthron, Brian; General Logistics Systems US Inc; General Logistics Systems US Interim Inc on 09/07/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 09/07/2021 04:38:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (person served Randy K Swart, Person Authorized to Accept; left docs with Alvin Chao (payroll)-person in charge of office on 5/12/21) filed by Cauthron, Brian on 05/14/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 04/26/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 04/26/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated class action on 04/26/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Time: 1:57 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 04/15/2021 01:57:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 04/12/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cauthron, Brian on 04/12/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cauthron, Brian on 04/12/2021. Filed By: Cauthron, Brian(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Logistics Systems US Interim Inc(Defendant) | Golden State Overnight Delivery Service Inc(Defendant) | General Logistics Systems US Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Logistics Systems US, Inc., forerly known as Golden State Overnight Delivery Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Golden State Overnight Delivery Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crawford, Matthew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORTON PETER JOSEPH