Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 07:21:36 (UTC).

Carolyn Harris vs. Richard Holloman

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Carolyn Harris filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Richard Holloman. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harris, Carolyn

Harris, Burton

Defendants

Holloman, Richard

Holloman, Lisa Harris

all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the Complaint adverse to Complaints title thereto named

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simone, Stuart

Defendant Attorney

Meinhardt, Jeffrey A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: MSC Meet and Confer Under CRC 3.724; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (4 day); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Pretrial Conference (CCM); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order (or Judgment) filed by Holloman, Richard on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (4 day); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Pretrial Conference (CCM); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 03/17/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 22 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPretrial Conference (CCM) - scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 43 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Holloman, Richard on 05/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Harris, Carolyn on 05/20/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 filed by Holloman, Richard on 05/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Harris, Burton; Harris, Carolyn on 04/12/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Harris, Carolyn; Harris, Carolyn on 04/12/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Harris, Burton; Harris, Carolyn on 01/15/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/24/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harris, Carolyn; Harris, Burton on 01/07/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Harris, Carolyn; Harris, Burton on 01/07/2019. Filed By: Harris, Burton(Plaintiff) | Harris, Carolyn(Plaintiff) Refers To: all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the Complaint adverse to Complaints title thereto named(Defendant) | Holloman, Richard(Defendant) | Holloman, Lisa(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEINHARDT JEFFREY