This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/04/2018 at 07:49:32 (UTC).

CAROL BROOKS VS CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

Case Summary

On 05/02/2005 CAROL BROOKS filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3471

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2005

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, DAVID

BROOKS, CAROL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SENECA GARDENS LIMITED

BULMER DEVELOPMENTCORPORATION

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SAN

CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

JOHNSON, DAVID

BULMER, MARGE

BROOKS, CAROL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

WOLF, ANDREW M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HURTADO, CAROLINE R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2006
  • 01/13/2006: (S) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE NOTICE TO PROCEED: FILE DEFAULT AS TO NON-RESPONDING X-DS ON X-C OF CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA (FLD 10-21-05) #2 Hearing: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2005
  • 12/28/2005: Case Management Order - Unlimited Civil Case filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2005
  • 12/22/2005: MOTION RE: TO VACATE ORDER DISMISSING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CAROL BROOKS, DAVID JOHNSON Hearing: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • 12/14/2005: This case # CIV233471 was ordered consolidated into case # CIV233470 on 12/09/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • 12/12/2005: Answer (Unlimited) to CROSS COMPLAINT of CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA filed by CAROL BROOKS, DAVID JOHNSON, represented by ANDREW M. WOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2005
  • 12/08/2005: Opposition to PLTFS' MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DISMISSING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT;DECLARATION OF CAROLINE HURTADO filed by CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • 11/28/2005: (S) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE RETURN OF SERVICE ON CROSS COMPLAINT of CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA AS TO NAMED CROSS-DEFENDANTS Hearing: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2005
  • 11/22/2005: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and CROSS COMPLAINT of CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA as to MARGE BULMER filed. Signed by: PAUL KELLEY. Date signed: 11/18/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2005
  • 11/22/2005: Original Summons returned as to CROSS COMPLAINT of CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2005
  • 11/22/2005: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and CROSS COMPLAINT of CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA as to BULMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION filed. Signed by: PAUL KELLEY. Date signed: 11/18/05

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2005
  • 08/31/2005: (S) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • 08/25/2005: 1ST Amended Summons issued; 30 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • 08/25/2005: 1st Amended COMPLAINT of BROOKS filed (Amended Complaint) Filed By: JOHNSON, DAVID(Plaintiff) | BROOKS, CAROL(Plaintiff) Refers To: SENECA GARDENS LIMITED(Defendant) | BULMER DEVELOPMENTCORPORATION(Defendant) | HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SAN(Defendant) | CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2005
  • 08/05/2005: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON COMPLAINT of BROOKS AS TO ALL UNSERVED NAMED DEFENDANTS Hearing: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • 05/02/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 47 - Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • 05/02/2005: Summons Issued; 30 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • 05/02/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • 05/02/2005: Case Information Sheet filed: Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time of trial: 5 DAYS. Mediation eligible: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • 05/02/2005: Track Assignment: Standard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • 05/02/2005: Complaint (Unlimited) filed Receipt Number: 505020063 for $235.0 Filed By: JOHNSON, DAVID(Plaintiff) | BROOKS, CAROL(Plaintiff) Refers To: SENECA GARDENS LIMITED(Defendant) | BULMER DEVELOPMENTCORPORATION(Defendant) | HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SAN(Defendant) | CITY OF SAN BUENAVENTURA(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BULMER DEVELOPMENTCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SENECA GARDENS LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURTADO, CAROLINE R