This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 07:45:36 (UTC).

Carmen Salgado vs. Edward Ortiz

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Carmen Salgado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Edward Ortiz. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salgado, Carmen

Defendants

Carniceria 4 Caminos

Ortiz, Edward

Ortiz Meat Market

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Parker, Michael R.

Defendant Attorney

Flores, Zojeila

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrtiz Meat Market added as a Defendant effective 03/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ortiz, Edward; Ortiz Meat Market on 03/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Alvaro Doe, Occupant) filed by Salgado, Carmen on 01/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Salgado, Carmen on 12/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Salgado, Carmen on 12/14/2020. Filed By: Salgado, Carmen(Plaintiff) Refers To: Carniceria 4 Caminos(Defendant) | Ortiz, Edward(Defendant) | Ortiz Meat Market(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER MICHAEL R.