This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:52:45 (UTC).

Captive Aire Systems Inc vs. Superior Air Inc

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Captive Aire Systems Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Superior Air Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Captive Aire Systems Inc

Defendants

Fast Track Construction Corporation

Great American Insurance Company

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Oxnard Union High School District

Superior Air Inc

The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Michael Leonard) filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Lai Saevang, Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 06/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Lai Saevang, Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 06/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Heather Banas, Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 06/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Def Oxnard Union High School District Only) filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 05/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 05/11/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Captive Aire Systems Inc on 05/11/2022. Filed By: Captive Aire Systems Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Great American Insurance Company(Defendant) | Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(Defendant) | Superior Air Inc(Defendant) | The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company(Defendant) | Oxnard Union High School District(Defendant) | Fast Track Construction Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAST-TRACK CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Captive-Aire Systems, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant