This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 20:15:51 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) NA vs. Jorge Fernandez

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Capital One Bank USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jorge Fernandez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA) NA

Defendant

Fernandez, Jorge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D Anna, Laura M.

Defendant Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk submitted by Capital One Bank (USA) NA rejected on 01/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fernandez, Jorge on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA on 06/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Attorney re Non Military Status) filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA on 05/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA on 05/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA on 05/14/2021. Filed By: Capital One Bank (USA) NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Fernandez, Jorge(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD