This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 00:13:44 (UTC).

California Resources vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 California Resources filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

California Resources Corporation

Respondents

Ventura County Board of Supervisors

County of Ventura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DINTZER, JEFFREY D.

Angiolillo, Gina M

Berlin, Gregory S

Wickersham, Matthew C

Respondent Attorneys

Zischke, Michael H

WALKER, MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:16 AM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:14 AM; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference; Description: [CEQA]; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of updated preliminary information for preparation of administrative record) filed by County of Ventura on 02/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Other (to Extend Deadline for Preparation & Certification of the Record ofproceedings) filed by County of Ventura; Ventura County Board of Supervisors on 01/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketResponse (to Notice of Related Cases) filed by County of Ventura; Ventura County Board of Supervisors on 01/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketWestern States Petroleum Association added as a Interested Party effective 01/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case No 20.546174.CU.WM.VTA, 20.546180.CU.WM.VTA, 20.546187.CU.TT.VTA) filed by Western States Petroleum Association on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (and Email - First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamujs and Complaint for Damages) filed by California Resources Corporation on 12/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPetition - Amended (Ceqa Case; First Amended Verified Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Damages and Declaratory Relief [Pub. Res. Code 21000, et seq (California Environmental Quality Act); Code Civ. Proc 1085 (alternatively 1094.5)]) filed by California Resources Corporation on 12/17/2020. Filed By: California Resources Corporation(Petitioner) Refers To: Ventura County Board of Supervisors(Respondent) | County of Ventura(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: [CEQA]; Event Status: REASSIGNED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Ana Hall Clerk of the Board) filed by California Resources Corporation on 11/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Order of Reassignment) filed by California Resources Corporation on 11/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:16 AM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 10/29/2020 10:16:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 41 effective 10/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued on 10/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRequest - Other (for Hearing Pursuant to Public Resources Code Section 21167.4) filed by California Resources Corporation on 10/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Resources Corporation on 10/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate (and Complaint for Damages and Declaratory Relief (CEQA Case)) filed by California Resources Corporation on 10/15/2020. Filed By: California Resources Corporation(Petitioner) Refers To: Ventura County Board of Supervisors(Respondent) | County of Ventura(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Resources Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ventura County Board of Supervisors is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angiolillo, Gina M