This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 06:36:58 (UTC).

California Business vs Beverly Clark LLC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 California Business filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Beverly Clark LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC

Defendants

Beverly Clark LLC

Beverly Clark and all persons claiming any legal or equitable title, estate, lien or interest in the property or any cloud on plaintiffs title thereto described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title

Beverly Clark

All persons claiming any legal or equitable title, estate, lien or interest in the property or any cloud on plaintiffs title thereto described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Love, Calvin F

Defendant Attorney

Rista, Anthony J.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Beverly Clark; Beverly Clark LLC on 01/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Description: to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint to Quiet Title; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Demurrer (CLM) heard 01/06/2021 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer; Memo of Points & Authorities) filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 11/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint to Quiet Title scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Beverly Clark LLC; Beverly Clark on 11/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - by counsel for Def Beverly Clark and Beverly Clark LLC scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDemurrer (to Complaint to Quiet Title; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ; Declaration of Anthony J Rista ESQ ; and Rquest for Judicial Notice) filed by Beverly Clark; Beverly Clark LLC on 08/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 07/27/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Beverly Clark, Agent for service of process) filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 07/27/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 07/16/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/29/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 02/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 02/24/2020. Filed By: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Beverly Clark LLC(Defendant) | Beverly Clark(Defendant) | All persons claiming any legal or equitable title, estate, lien or interest in the property or any cloud on plaintiffs title thereto described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE CALVIN F.