This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 03:45:49 (UTC).

Cach LLC vs. Teresa Cherly Raimondi

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Cach LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Teresa Cherly Raimondi. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cach LLC

Defendant

Raimondi, Teresa Cherly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lusis, Karen Etsell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCase File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cach LLC on 07/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service filed by Cach LLC on 05/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Cach LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketDeclaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by Cach LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cach LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Cach LLC on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Cach LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Raimondi, Teresa(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Etsell Lusis