Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:33 (UTC).

CACH LLC vs. Steven C Chatterton

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven C Chatterton. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

Chatterton, Steven C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lopez, Tiffany M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2015
  • Abstract issued on 12/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Mandarich Law Group LLP) filed by CACH LLC on 02/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Judgment for CACH LLC against Chatterton, Steven C in the amount of: 10583.27 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 430.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 800.00 attorney fees entered on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment - CCP585 filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Declaration - Other (Re accepting copies in lieu of originals) filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Declaration in Support (of calculation of accrued interest and atty fees) filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Default entered as to Chatterton, Steven C on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (and clerks judgment) filed by CACH LLC on 09/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Luis Doe, person in charge) filed by CACH LLC on 07/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: CACH LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Chatterton, Steven(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less