Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:29 (UTC).

CACH LLC vs. Roger A Novak

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Roger A Novak. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

Novak, Roger A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Avagyan, Nare

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2016
  • Writ has been updated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by CACH LLC on 02/05/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Writ issued on 05/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CACH LLC on 05/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Mandarich Law Group LLP) filed by CACH LLC on 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Judgment for CACH LLC against Novak, Roger A in the amount of: 4780.80 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 570.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 02/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Judgment - Stipulated filed by CACH LLC on 02/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Notice - Other (of Non Appearance per CRC3.1304c) filed by CACH LLC on 01/15/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Application - Other (for Exparte Order for Entry of Judgment. Declaration of Atty in support thereof) filed by CACH LLC on 01/15/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Notice - Other (of Pltfs Exparte Application for Entry of Judgment) filed by CACH LLC on 01/15/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement (Oct 15 2016) filed by CACH LLC on 08/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CACH LLC on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: CACH LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Novak, Roger(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less