Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:22 (UTC).

CACH LLC vs. R H Eaton

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R H Eaton. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

Eaton, R H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herme, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Mandarich Law Group LLP) filed by CACH LLC on 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 02/18/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by CACH LLC on 01/26/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 02/18/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by CACH LLC on 07/29/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: CACH LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Eaton, R(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less