Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:13:39 (UTC).

CACH LLC vs. Gabor Klein

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gabor Klein. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

Klein, Gabor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sabawi, Nader

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest ($115.00 costs, $0.00 credit, $792.72 Interest) filed by CACH LLC on 02/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Writ has been updated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by CACH LLC on 08/20/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Mandarich Law Group LLP) filed by CACH LLC on 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Writ issued on 01/14/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 00 credit 00 interest 97.13) filed by CACH LLC on 01/14/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Judgment for CACH LLC against Klein, Gabor in the amount of: 2643.31 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 241.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 660.83 attorney fees entered on 09/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by CACH LLC on 09/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment - CCP585 filed by CACH LLC on 09/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2014
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by CACH LLC on 09/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by CACH LLC on 09/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Default entered as to Klein, Gabor on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by CACH LLC on 09/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CACH LLC on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by CACH LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: CACH LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Klein, Gabor(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less