This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/12/2020 at 17:41:51 (UTC).

Bridgette A Payton vs. Scott Smith

Case Summary

On 01/07/2011 Bridgette A Payton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Scott Smith. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Bridgette A Payton is Successor Trustee of The Gary L Payton Trust July 8,

Mendoza, Rogelio E

Payton, Bridgette A

Defendants and Cross Defendants

David Phillips Trustee of the David K Phillips & Lynn E Phillips Family Trust

Lynn Phillips Trustee of the David K Phillips & Lynn E Phillips Family Trust

Phillips.., Lynn K

Claudia Smith as Trustee of the Scott & Claudia Smith recovable living trust

Falkenstein, Roseann

Scott Smith as Trustee of the Scott & Claudia Smith recovable living trust

Archer, Steve

Barrett, Helen

David Phillips Co Trustee of the David K Phillips & Lynne E Phillips Family Trust

David Phillips Trustee of the David K Phillips and Lynn E Phillips Family Trust.

Glenn Marshall Hunter Trustee of the Glenn Marshall Hunter Trust Created

Hunter, Carolyn

Hunter, Glenn

Hunter, Glenn Marshall

Kuehn, Johannes

Kuehn, Rosemarie

Lynn K Phillips Trustee of the David K Phillips and Lynn E Phillips Family Trust

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Archer, Steve

Barrett, Helen

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Labrum, Michael

Catanese, T Randolph

LYDEN, CHRISTINE C

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Briscoe, J Jackson

FEUERBORN, ARTHUR MARK

ROBERTSON, ALEXANDER IV

LABAT, KAREN M

SHULKIN, ROBERT J.

KOEP, RICHARD M

Miller, Mark F

Fitz Simmons, Doug

Tedesco, David N.

Other Attorneys

Gunny, Neil R

Hendrickson, Jennie A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (Cross Complaint filed by Troop Real Estate Inc Janet Vanbibber) filed by Troop Real Estate Inc; Van Bibber, Janet on 03/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Cross Complaint of Helen Barrett) filed by Barrett, Helen on 03/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (cross complaint filed by Kuenn) filed by Kuehn, Johannes; Kuehn, Rosemarie on 03/19/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Description: RE: Dismissal and Status of Arbitraton; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM) heard 03/16/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (Cross Complaint) filed by Archer, Steve on 03/13/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Payton, Bridgette A on 03/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Barrett, Helen on 03/05/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
930 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication heard 04/14/2011 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketCourt's Order to Show Cause (CCM) re: Dismissal for failure to file proof of service/publication is scheduled for 05/19/2011 at 01:30 PM in Department S1CM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketCourt's Order to Show Cause (CCM) - re: Dismissal for failure to file proof of service/publication scheduled for 05/19/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 04/14/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration for Court Assignment filed by Payton, Bridgette A; Mendoza, Rogelio E; Payton, Gary L on 01/07/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Payton, Bridgette A; Mendoza, Rogelio E; Payton, Gary L on 01/07/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed by Payton, Bridgette A; Mendoza, Rogelio E; Payton, Gary L on 01/07/2011. Refers To: David Phillips Trustee of the David K Phillips & Lynn E Phillips Family Trust(Defendant) | Lynn Phillips Trustee of the David K Phillips & Lynn E Phillips Family Trust(Defendant) | Phillips, David(Defendant) | Phillips.., Lynn(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hendrickson, Jennie A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gunny, Neil R