This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/14/2023 at 07:27:31 (UTC).

Brett Nielson vs. Shannon Courtney

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Brett Nielson filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Shannon Courtney. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CUHR

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

Courtney, Shannon

Nielson, Brett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

Zhamakochyan, Siranush

Michie, Douglas C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingName: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; 11/09/2022 Department 31 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; 11/09/2022 Department 34 Reassigned; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 31 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 12/13/2022, Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingName: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; 11/09/2022 Department 31 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; 11/09/2022 Department 34 Reassigned; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 31 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 12/13/2022, Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe Court orders the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders dismissed .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe Court orders the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders dismissed .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Matthew R. Eccles to Siranush Zhamakochyan) filed by Courtney, Shannon on 11/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • HearingName: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; 11/09/2022 Department 34 Reassigned; Status: Rescheduled; Department: Dept 31 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 11/09/2022, Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 12/13/2022 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • HearingName: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; 11/09/2022 Department 34 Reassigned; 10/07/2022 Department 34 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; Status: Rescheduled; Department: Dept 31 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 11/09/2022, Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 12/13/2022 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • HearingName: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; 10/07/2022 Department 34 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; Status: Rescheduled; Department: Dept 34 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 10/12/2022, Reassigned to 11/09/2022 11:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Nielson, Brett on 09/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Courtney, Shannon on 09/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Nielson, Brett on 09/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Nielson, Brett on 09/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Nielson, Brett on 09/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketConsent For Court Assignment filed by Nielson, Brett on 09/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 34.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Nielson, Brett on 09/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less