This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 20:34:55 (UTC).

Bray vs Habitat for Humanity

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 Bray filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Habitat for Humanity. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bray, Terry

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

City of Camarillo

Habitat for Humanity Ventura County Inc

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Habitat for Humanity Ventura County Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Procter, James N. II

NUNZIATO, TOM A

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

NUNZIATO, TOM A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 2:39 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Reconsideration (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Reconsideration (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:26 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Fee Waiver Hearing (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 2:39 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • Cross-Complaint filed by City of Camarillo on 11/28/2016. Filed By: City of Camarillo(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Habitat for Humanity Ventura County Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Answer filed by City of Camarillo on 11/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Answer (to Complaint) filed by Habitat for Humanity Ventura County Inc on 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • NUNZIATO, TOM A added as a effective 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bray, Terry on 10/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Beatriz Rivera, administrator specialist) filed by Bray, Terry on 10/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/10/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bray, Terry on 10/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Complaint filed by Bray, Terry on 10/11/2016. Filed By: Bray, Terry(Plaintiff) Refers To: City of Camarillo(Defendant) | Habitat for Humanity Ventura County Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less