This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 16:10:15 (UTC).

Brant vs. Coastal View Healthcare

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Brant filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Coastal View Healthcare. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brant, Gerald L

Brant, Christina M

Defendant

Coastal View Healthcare Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gambardella, Steven C.

APELIAN, MARK D.

Defendant Attorney

Walker, Kathleen

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike; Description: Portions of the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarat...; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Demurrer (CLM); Description: to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christ...; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 01/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 01/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Portions of the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christopher G Washington Pursuant to CCP 435.5 scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christopher G Washington Pursuant to CCP 430.41 and 430.5 scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christopher G Washington Pursuant to CCP 430.41 and 430.5) filed by Coastal View Healthcare Center on 01/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (Portions of the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christopher G Washington Pursuant to CCP 435.5) filed by Coastal View Healthcare Center on 01/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 12/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (Second) filed by Brant, Gerald L; Brant, Christina M on 12/06/2021. Filed By: Brant, Christina M(Plaintiff) | Brant, Gerald L(Plaintiff) Refers To: Coastal View Healthcare Center(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Plaintiffs Complaint scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - to Plaintiffs Complaint scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (Plaintiffs Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Jenifer Hassell Pursuant to CCP 435.5, Exhibit) filed by Coastal View Healthcare Center on 06/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDemurrer (to Plaintiffs Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Jenifer Hassell Pursuant to CCP 430.41, Exhibit) filed by Coastal View Healthcare Center on 06/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES - Served Monique P. - Person Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Brant, Christina M; Brant, Gerald L on 06/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Brant, Christina M; Brant, Gerald L on 05/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages filed by Brant, Christina M; Brant, Gerald L on 05/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brant, Gerald L; Brant, Christina M on 04/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Brant, Gerald L; Brant, Christina M on 04/01/2021. Filed By: Brant, Christina M(Plaintiff) | Brant, Gerald L(Plaintiff) Refers To: Coastal View Healthcare Center(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coastal View Healthcare Center LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.