Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 09:54:04 (UTC).

Bradley R. Starbird vs. James Perry

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Bradley R Starbird filed an Other lawsuit against James Perry. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Starbird, Lauren E.

Starbird, Bradley R.

Respondents

Perry, James

Perry, Cathy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lieber, Jeffrey E

Respondent Attorney

PARKE, JOHN H.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order (on Petition to Appoint Arbitrator) filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition - Other; Description: to Appoint Arbitrator; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Petition to Appoint Arbitrator CCP 1281.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Other (Joint List of Proposed Arbitrators Pursuant to CCP 1281.6) filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (OLD Jeffrey E Lieber NEW Kevin L Dorhout) filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 01/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition - Other; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition - Other; Description: to Appoint Arbitrator; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other - to Appoint Arbitrator scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 01/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 01/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Joint List of proposed arbitrator per CCP 1281.6) filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketResponse (to Petition to Appoint Arbitrator) filed by Perry, James; Perry, Cathy on 12/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other - to Appoint Arbitrator scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 11/04/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other (to Appoint Arbitrator) filed by Starbird, Bradley R.; Starbird, Lauren E. on 11/04/2020. Filed By: Starbird, Lauren E.(Petitioner) | Starbird, Bradley R.(Petitioner) Refers To: Perry, James(Respondent) | Perry, Cathy(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKE, JOHN H.