This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 14:00:08 (UTC).

Borngraeber vs. American Medical Response

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Borngraeber filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against American Medical Response. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Borngraeber, Bertha

Defendants

American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc

American Medical Response Inc

American Medical Response West

American Medical Response of Southern California

City of San Buenaventura

County of Ventura

Global Medical Response Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Previant, Lee W

Defendant Attorney

LEIBL, LOREN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Strike Request for Attorney Fees; forwarded to CR 42) submitted by Borngraeber, Bertha; American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc rejected on 08/02/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc on 07/27/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Request for Attorney Fees) filed by American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc on 07/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Trial Attorney) filed by American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc on 07/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc on 07/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to County of Ventura and City of San Buenaventura ONLY) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 07/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Received on 06 17 2022) submitted by Borngraeber, Bertha rejected on 06/23/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company, Registered Agent) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company, Registered Agent) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Trudy Desbien, Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Person other than the Party in item 3a of the POS, served on behalf of Entity as authorized agent) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Person other than the Party in item 3a of the POS, served on behalf of Entity as authorized agent) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company, Registered Agent) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service (Summons; Complaint) filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 06/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued on 05/25/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Summons) submitted by Borngraeber, Bertha rejected on 05/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 05/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Borngraeber, Bertha on 05/19/2022. Filed By: Borngraeber, Bertha(Plaintiff) Refers To: Global Medical Response Inc(Defendant) | City of San Buenaventura(Defendant) | American Medical Response Inc(Defendant) | American Medical Response West(Defendant) | American Medical Response of Southern California(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant) | American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc(Defendant) | American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GLOBAL MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. is a litigant