This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/09/2022 at 00:04:14 (UTC).

Black vs. Tom Sanchez Construction

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Black filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tom Sanchez Construction. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Black, Jackalyn

Black, Joseph T III

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Sanchez, Thomas Joseph

Tom Sanchez Construction Inc

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

Tom Sanchez Construction Inc

Antoinette Designs Inc

Cal Coast Tile & Stone

Eurotech Cabinets Inc

Coast Door & Hardware

Decor West

Bill Davis Drywall Inc

DG Millar

Russell Delfino Electric

California Wall Systems Drywall

Callenders House of Glass

Richco Plumbing & Drain

Kaiser Air Conditioning and Sheet Metal Inc

J Fernando Perez Fine Stain Finish

CDA Inc

Affordable Electricians Inc

Wakiyan Flooring Installers

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS, CAROLYN C

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LYNCH, ROBERT J.

EBNER, DARREN M

Eum, Margaret N

LOUREIRO, KARL R.

Other Attorneys

Wang, Regina

JEFFERY, MONA J.

Wang Jaramillo, Regina

Seal, David

DALMORE, JEAN A.

Boggs, Josiah

MCGUIRE, RICHARD S

Michael, Ethan O.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:11 PM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: Application for Order Pursuant to Corporations Code 1702 Authorizing Service of Cross-Defendant Bill...; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Further Case Management Conference) filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc on 04/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - Application for Order Pursuant to Corporations Code 1702 Authorizing Service of Cross-Defendant Bill Davis Drywall, Inc. by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 04/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMotion - Other (Application for Order Pursuant to Corporations Code 1702 Authorizing Service of Cross-Defendant Bill Davis Drywall, Inc. by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State; Declaration of John E. Black) filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc; Sanchez, Thomas Joseph on 04/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Cross Defendant DG Millar Construction) filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Cross Defendant Millennium Fire Protection ONLY) filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Cross Defendant Dyno Decking) filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Cross Defendant Decor West ONLY) filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
255 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike (Portions of the Black's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Sanchez, Thomas Joseph; Tom Sanchez Construction Inc on 10/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 filed by Tom Sanchez Construction Inc; Sanchez, Thomas Joseph on 09/09/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/28/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Melanie Stroman, Legal Zoom Authorized Agent) filed by Black, Joseph T III; Black, Jackalyn on 08/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Nicole Poniewaz, Secretary) filed by Black, Joseph T III; Black, Jackalyn on 08/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/30/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Black, Joseph T III; Black, Jackalyn on 07/29/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Black, Joseph T III; Black, Jackalyn on 07/29/2019. Filed By: Black, Joseph T III(Plaintiff) | Black, Jackalyn(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sanchez, Thomas(Defendant) | Tom Sanchez Construction Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Wall Systems Drywall is a litigant

Latest cases where Callenders House of Glass is a litigant

Latest cases where Eurotech Cabinets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Coast Door & Hardware is a litigant