This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 05:00:14 (UTC).

Bettini vs. The Regents of the University of CA

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Bettini filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Regents of the University of CA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bettini, Adaline

Bettini, Dominic

Defendants

Field MD, Christin

Los Robles Regional Medical Center

Mehran MD, Amir Hossein

Nathan MD, Ramesh

The Regents of the University of California

Uhrinak MD, Abby

Valle MD, Angela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, MARC D.

Defendant Attorneys

Wright, David M.

Connely, Mark B

Schaeffer, James C.

PACKER, ROBERT B.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference heard 12/19/2022 08:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bettini, Adaline; Bettini, Dominic on 12/07/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by The Regents of the University of California on 12/06/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Los Robles Regional Medical Center on 12/05/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (David Wright Esq) filed by Bettini, Adaline; Bettini, Dominic on 07/15/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Served Brooke Haber) filed by Bettini, Adaline; Bettini, Dominic on 07/15/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt submitted by Bettini, Adaline; Bettini, Dominic rejected on 07/12/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt submitted by Bettini, Dominic; Bettini, Adaline rejected on 07/08/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to ONLY Christin Field, M.D., Angela Valle, M.D. and Abby Uhrinak, M.D.) filed by Bettini, Adaline; Bettini, Dominic on 07/02/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 06/18/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Dominic Bettini) filed by Bettini, Adaline on 06/18/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bettini, Dominic; Bettini, Adaline on 06/11/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bettini, Dominic; Bettini, Adaline on 06/11/2021. Filed By: Bettini, Dominic(Plaintiff) | Bettini, Adaline(Plaintiff) Refers To: The Regents of the University of California(Defendant) | Field MD, Christin(Defendant) | Valle MD, Angela(Defendant) | Uhrinak MD, Abby(Defendant) | Los Robles Regional Medical Center(Defendant) | Nathan MD, Ramesh(Defendant) | Mehran MD, Amir Hossein(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER MOB, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT DAVID M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Connely, Mark B